KINGHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising in order to pay for additional activities at Kingham Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 January 2008: Standard registration
- KPSA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Prockter | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.36k | £15.29k | £14.12k | £34.46k | £22.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.71k | £35.39k | £34.31k | £26.22k | £7.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GREEN
KINGHAM
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 6YD
- Phone:
- 01608658300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window