Financial history TRUE VINE PENTECOSTAL CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1123132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £18.82k £13.79k £11.18k £21.61k £8.63k
Total expenditure £19.97k £14.30k £11.50k £21.84k £15.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.90k N/A