Financial history KINGS LANGLEY INFANT PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.12k £0 £7.07k £10.39k £10.76k
Total expenditure £3.14k £174 £4.88k £12.51k £18.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A