Financial history THE LIFE CHURCH - MAIDSTONE

Charity Number: 1123130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.26k £43.14k £67.77k £116.94k £172.71k
Total expenditure £51.15k £41.60k £69.86k £167.83k £188.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A