THE DJ SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the DJ School Association shall be to encourage and promote the educational and career development of people of all backgrounds particularly disadvantaged children and young people and adults , living in Staffordshire and Cheshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 19 November 2008: Standard registration
- THE DJ SCHOOL / DJSA (Working name)
- U7 SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL INTERVENTION SERVICES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Oliver Falconer | Chair | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Sutton | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Warrilow | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH armitt | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.36k | £36.85k | £17.62k | £13.88k | £12.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.53k | £33.41k | £16.85k | £10.20k | £10.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 6 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE DJ SCHOOL ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND CAREER DEVELOPMENT OF PEOPLE OF ALL BACKGROUNDS PARTICULARLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, LIVING IN STAFFORDSHIRE AND CHESHIRE. 1) FOSTERING PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH A RANGE OF CREATIVE ACTIVITIES INCLUDING DJING, SONG WRITING, MUSIC, MUSIC PERFORMANCE, MUSIC TECHNOLOGY AND PRODUCTION AND VOCALS. 2) CREATING HIGH QUALITY MUSIC MAKING AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES. WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING BENEFICIARIES' CONFIDENCE, TEAM WORKING SKILLS, LITERACY, NUMERACY AND SELF ESTEEM.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
unit2
Sydney Works
Longton
STOKE-ON-TRENT
STAFFORDSHIRE
ST3 1HT
- Phone:
- 01782698182
- Email:
- DJSCHOOL_ADMIN@BTCONNECT.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window