I LIKE IT PRODUCTIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
I LIKE IT PRODUCTIONS CURRENTLY BASED IN LONDON ISLINGTON AND OPERATING THROUGHOUT THE UK. OUR ACTIVITIES ARE: MUSIC PRODUCTIONS ARTISTE DEVELOPMENT PERFORMANCE DEVELOPMENT ARTS & CULTURE SPORTS MULTI MEDIA HEALTH & EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- I LIKE IT PRODUCTIONS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £10 | £50 | £30 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20 | £0 | £80 | £10 | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 26 June 2018 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 05 July 2017 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
THE COUNCIL'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: A. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF LONDON AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; B. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE \ PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; PROVIDED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THESE CHARITABLE PURPOSES, THE COUNCIL WILL SEEK TO CHALLENGE ALL FORMS OF OPPRESSION AND INEQUALITY AND TO GIVE PRIORITY TO WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHOSE FULL PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY IS LIMITED BY ECONOMIC, POLITICAL AND SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window