FRIENDS OF JENYNS SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AS A PTA WE ORGANISE A WIDE RANGE OF ACTIVITIES TO SUPPORT THE VALUE ADDED ACTIVITIES OF THE SCHOOL RANGING FROM EVENTS THAT PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THE SCHOOL COMMUNITY, SUCH AS THE LEAVERS PRESENTS, CHRISTINGLE SERVICES AND CHRISTMAS TREE FOR THE SCHOOL, FUN SOCIAL EVENTS FOR CHILDREN SUCH AS PANTOMIMES, MAD MONEY, DISCOS AND OUR LARGER FUNDRAISING EVENTS INCLUDING THE CHRISTMAS AND SUMMER FAIRS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 June 2008: Standard registration
- 09 February 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 November 2017: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Jenkins | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.23k | £1.77k | £2.00k | £9.59k | £20.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.99k | £590 | £5.97k | £7.19k | £18.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 17 SEP 2007
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, HERTFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jenyns First School & Nursery
Uplands
Braughing
WARE
SG11 2QJ
- Phone:
- 07739693754
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window