Accounts and annual returns TREE TOPS

Charity Number: 1124620
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 August 2022 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 August 2022 207 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 April 2021 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 April 2021 68 days late