CORINTHIAN CHAMBER ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rehearse for, and perform, at least six public concerts each concert season commencing in September in each year and ending in July in the following year and in doing so assist players to improve their musical skills in an orchestral environment and provide a platform for young soloists embarking on professional careers to gain experience in concerto performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 12 August 2008: Standard registration
- CCO (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HYWEL JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Cathy McGinn | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Mead | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE LOUISE DOYLE | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE YVONNE MOISSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andy Feist | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK RIDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.43k | £6.07k | £32.13k | £59.01k | £63.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.99k | £4.51k | £36.78k | £51.12k | £55.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
The objects of the society shall be: 1. to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals; 2. to further such charitable purpose or purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion shall think fit but in particular through the making of grants and donations.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 BRIARWOOD ROAD
LONDON
SW4 9PX
- Phone:
- 07740589527
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window