Financial history ST. JOSEPH'S SCHOOL PFA

Charity Number: 1124689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £18.67k £8.31k £21.00k £18.49k £24.35k
Total expenditure £16.19k £3.49k £19.90k £24.33k £22.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A