THE SHEFFIELD WHEELCHAIR SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We supply users, specifically members confined to a wheelchair, or those who need to compete from a wheelchair, with the facilities and equipment to participate in a large number of sports. eg. Basketball, Archery, Bowls, Wheelchair Rugby, Table Tennis, Snooker, Pool, Sailing, Weight training and fitness, Air Rifle and Pistol etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Lancashire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 December 1970: Standard registration
- LODGE MOOR SPINAL UNIT SPORTS CLUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ROBINSON | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BARNES | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HALES | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RYAN | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|||||
JOANNE HARPER | Trustee | 10 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £1.12k | £10.03k | £1.60k | £1.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20k | £1.16k | £778 | £968 | £2.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 October 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 October 2021 | 446 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/09/1970 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/1995 AS AMENDED ON 31/10/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS WITH PARTIUCLAR REFERENCE TO BENEFICIARIES BEING PATIENTS OR FORMER PATIENTS OF LODGE MOOR SPINAL INJURIES UNIT. 2. IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE BENEFICIARES.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 PARKERS LANE
DORE
SHEFFIELD
S17 3DP
- Phone:
- 07843412802
- Email:
- harpic@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window