NEW HOPE FELLOWSHIP CHURCH MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF PASTORAL SERVICES TO THE COMMUNITY, TO REGULARLY PREACH AND TEACH THE WORD OF GOD AND ADMINISTER THE SACRAMENTS IN THE CONGREGATION. TO PLAN AND LEAD WORSHIP IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE OTHER PASTORS OF THE PARISH.. TO OFFICIATE AT SPECIAL SERVICES SUCH AS WEDDINGS, FUNERALS, NURSING HOME SERVICES, ETC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 July 2008: Standard registration
- IGREJA ASSEMBLEIA DE DEUS DE - MANCHESTER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ezequias Santos | Chair | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariano Gauna Filho | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.41k | £99.27k | £120.00k | £122.67k | £126.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.53k | £92.38k | £118.00k | £116.47k | £114.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ("THE OBJECTS"): (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW HOPE FELLOWSHIP CHURCH
TATTON STREET
MANCHESTER
M15 4EQ
- Phone:
- 01618390438
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window