SHAK (SAFE HOMES AND KINDNESS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering of large breeds of dogs in need of care and attention, and, in particular, to provide and maintain rescue homes or other facilities for the reception, care and treatment of such large dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 23 July 2008: Standard registration
- SHAK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN PHILIP WYLIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOAN MARGARET BRITTLEBANK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.39k | £211.49k | £208.95k | £248.03k | £255.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.62k | £180.43k | £223.55k | £219.11k | £258.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.46k | £15.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 158 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 19 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED ON 06 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DOGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
S H A K
Greenwell Road
ALNWICK
NE66 1HB
- Phone:
- 07931702345
- Email:
- shak@shak.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window