CREWE BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of brass, percussion and wind music in all aspects by the provision of training, practical advice & support including the loan of musical instruments, the presentation of public concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 17 September 2008: Standard registration
- CERAMIC BRASS BAND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Davyd Michell | Chair | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Tatton | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.01k | £4.08k | £1.05k | £4.02k | £6.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.68k | £1.99k | £1.78k | £5.45k | £5.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF BRASS, PERCUSSION AND WIND MUSIC IN ALL ASPECTS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT INCLUDING THE LOAN OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSE OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17th SW Cheshire Scout HQ
Queen Street
Crewe
Cheshire
CW1 4AU
- Phone:
- 07955725071
- Email:
- crewebrassband@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window