Accounts and annual returns MY COMMUNITY SPACE

Charity number: 1125415
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 24 April 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2016 28 June 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 28 June 2017 28 days late