MY COMMUNITY SPACE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a web site as a portal for Partners to offer their space-to-share and Users find meeting rooms and work areas. There are usually approximately a thousand spaces available nationally and approximately 10,000 views a month on average.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 August 2008: Standard registration
- 02 August 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- RELIEF AID LOGISTICS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £780 | £57.37k | £7.27k | £64.30k | £240.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £818 | £57.23k | £7.08k | £55.34k | £292.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 24 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 24 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 28 June 2017 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 28 June 2017 | 28 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18/07/ 2008 AS AMENDED 01/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/05/2015 AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUITABLE BUILDINGS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PROVISION OF: A STANDBY WAREHOUSE AND TRANSHIPMENT FACILITIES FOR THE COLLECTION, STORAGE, PROCESSING AND ONWARD DELIVERY OF RELIEF SUPPLIES BY RELIEF CHARITIES; B STANDBY WAREHOUSE AND TRANSHIPMENT FACILITIES FOR THE COLLECTION, STORAGE, PROCESSING AND ONWARD DELIVERY OF THE DECEASED IN THE EVENT OF A DISASTER OR EMERGENCY IN ORDER TO PROTECT THE PUBLIC BY MINIMISING CONTAMINATION AND DISEASE; C STANDBY PREMISES, FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO PROTECT THE PUBLIC IN THE EVENT OF A DISASTER OR EMERGENCY; D FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF PREMISES AND WORK SPACE FOR CHARITABLE USE E TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) PROMOTING, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING VOLUNTEERING, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO OUTREACH AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF PROSPECTIVE VOLUNTEERS TO CHOOSE A CHARITY TO VOLUNTEER FOR; (B) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS TO VOLUNTEER, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO COMMUNICATIONS, EXHIBITIONS AND PROMOTION EVENTS IN GENERAL HELPING CHARITIES CONVEY THE OPPORTUNITIES, COMMUNITY CONTRIBUTION AND BENEFITS OF VOLUNTEERING; (C) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND TRAINING FOR VOLUNTEERS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE UNEMPLOYED, THOSE WISHING TO RETURN TO WORK, STUDENTS AND THE RETIRED. SUBJECT TO SUCH CHARGES AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window