PETERBOROUGH AFRICAN COMMUNITY ORGANISATION - PACO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peterborough African Community Organisation has been the charity behind Peterborough Community Radio since 2007. The project has been used as a regeneration tool to deliver outputs of social benefit as well as bringing people together to learn from one another working toward community cohesion. PACO has years of track record in delivering innovative community based projects in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 05 August 2008: Standard registration
- 11 April 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- PACO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.92k | £145.24k | £120.36k | £45.94k | £19.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.48k | £154.03k | £116.17k | £58.66k | £26.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 28 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 28 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 03 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 03 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 25 NOV 2005
Charitable objects
The objects of the association are to: (a) promote the benefit of the inhabitants of the area of benefit without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, nationality, age, disability, race or of political, religious or other opinions, by associating together the said inhabitants and the statutory authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants; (b) establish, or secure the establishment, of a Community Centre (hereinafter called "the Centre") and to maintain and manage the same (whether alone or in co-operation with any local authority or other person or body) in furtherance of these objects; (c) promote such other charitable purposes as may from time to time be determined. The Association shall be non-party in politics and non-sectarian in religion. The area of benefit shall be ..........and the neighbourhood together defined by...........................
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window