Financial history NOMAD INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1125547
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023
Total gross income £2.12k £3.50k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.21k £3.49k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A