WATFORD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The performance of concerts and related activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bill Randles | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS GAY DEMARCO | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MS VICKY VANDY | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIETTE ANNE O'BIERNE | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM PATRICK GARRETT | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE QUINN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £1.42k | £11.09k | £15.91k | £14.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.60k | £2.95k | £12.24k | £14.74k | £13.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 01 AUG 2007
Charitable objects
The objects of the society shall be: 1. to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals; 2. to further such charitable purpose or purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion shall think fit but in particular through the making of grants and donations.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 BEACONSFIELD ROAD
TRING
HP23 4DP
- Phone:
- 01442 827763
- Email:
- wso@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window