LONDON IMMIGRATION CLINIC (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1126483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Immigration issues including consultation, applications and home office representation. Provision of educational courses including numeracy, literacy and information and communication technology. Fund raising activities geared to alleviating poverty and reducing homelessness amongst indigenous communities. Sponsorship for overseas students in conjunction with sister NGO - Ceford SL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LIC (UK) LTD (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR WILKIN WILHELM PHD Chair
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 June 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 March 2021 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 CALSHOT AVENUE
CHAFFORD HUNDRED
GRAYS
RM16 6QY
Phone:
07956891035
Email:
No information available