ICARUS THEATRE COLLECTIVE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mainly touring drama in the United Kingdom and Repulic of Ireland. Also running of London office and education programme, bringing workshops across the country. Fundraising for venue acquisition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £88,204 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 26 February 2010: Standard registration
- ICARUS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ILAN LEWENDEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sally Franks | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Schunmann | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Gould | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE LEWENDEL | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
STELLA PE-WIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.50k | £183.24k | £355.49k | £324.51k | £131.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.25k | £113.64k | £348.06k | £332.66k | £29.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.48k | £3.00k | £255.29k | N/A | £88.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Company is established are:- To advance education for the public benefit by the promotion of the arts, in particular but not exclusively the art of drama
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Gordon Road
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP13 6ER
- Phone:
- 02079981562
- Email:
- INFO@ICARUSTHEATRE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window