TIMPERLEY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A variety of services on Sunday and Thursday's offer people a selection of opportunities to worship. During the week we have numerous activity sessions ranging from badminton to weight watching along with activities for young people (Girls Brigade, Brownies and Guides, Youth Fellowships, Parent and toddlers and a play group)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Trafford
Governance
- 03 November 2008: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JANET ASPEY | Chair | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Watchorn | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Orpet | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Glenton Owen | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Annette Elliott | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Carol Tait | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rita Mary Borgen | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Paul Foster | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Watts | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosalinda Jean Fazackerley | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE RUTH GRIFFITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.49k | £67.80k | £68.72k | £102.86k | £90.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.23k | £97.27k | £100.38k | £97.49k | £97.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Timperley Methodist Church
Stockport Road
Timperley
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 7UG
- Phone:
- 01619280022
- Website:
-
timperleymethodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window