THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide encouragement, advice and support to member churches so that they too may maximise their ability to achieve their own charitable objective of making Jesus Christ known to individuals and society in general.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 September 2008: Previously excepted registration
- 19 August 2014: Funds received from 1120939 CHURCH OF PROMISE
- BUGB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohan Pandian | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.93m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.15m | £2.80m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.12m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.18m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £525.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £100.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £569.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.09m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £57.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £288.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.52m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2025 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/05/2008 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/2009 AS AMENDED ON 04/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2014 as amended on 12 May 2018 as amended on 15 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE UNION IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND ITS PRACTICE, ESPECIALLY BY THE MEANS OF AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Baptist Union of Great Britain
PO Box 44
Didcot
OX11 8RT
- Phone:
- 01235517743
- Email:
- info@baptist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window