WORTHY DOWN PRI FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund supports Garrison activities such as the annual Bonfire Night, Garrison Fun Day and Families Activities Week. It also supports individuals and teams in activities that provide a benefit in terms of performance and retention. The Fund also facilitates a trading account which provides a benefit to all personnel within Worthy Down and AGC personnel worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 October 2008: Standard registration
- WORTHY DOWN STATION PRI FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Johnston | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.39k | £96.78k | £122.21k | £198.78k | £273.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.53k | £63.92k | £101.55k | £162.92k | £347.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 15 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED 4 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF MESS, SOCIAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINISTRY OF DEFENCE
WORTHY DOWN CAMP
WORTHY DOWN
WINCHESTER
SO21 2RG
- Phone:
- 01962 887190
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window