Trustees CHRIST CHURCH LIVERPOOL
Charity number: 1125990

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Northover | Chair | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Shin | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chris Rowe | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN CHEVASSUT | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Josh Probert | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID WILKINSON | Trustee | 19 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER GREGORY | Trustee | 14 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
Dr THOMAS GEOFFREY ASKEW | Trustee | 28 August 2008 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE ROBERT MCCRACKEN | Trustee | 28 August 2008 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN GILMOUR | Trustee | 28 August 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.