Financial history AL -ISHARAH

Charity number: 1126533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £205.25k £558.70k £426.39k £567.08k £599.05k
Total expenditure £208.66k £258.57k £317.96k £422.95k £481.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £469.42k N/A £564.08k £538.19k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.53k N/A £0 £32.62k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £87.74k N/A £3.00k £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £17 N/A £0 £5.48k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £22.76k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £258.57k N/A £422.95k £481.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.15k N/A £1.19k £1.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0