GOBIND MARG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Sikh religion by preaching and promoting its teachings, to relieve poverty by providing food, clothing and shelter, to advance education and to promote health and relieve sickness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Bolivia
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- India
- Italy
- Malaysia
- New Zealand
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 16 January 2009: Standard registration
- NAWAN NANAKSAR THATH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR S S CHOHAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kuljit Singh FCCA CTA | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
K S MANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS SIDHU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
J S BOPARAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BS JOHAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RS SIDHU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.00k | £249.05k | £240.24k | £325.05k | £384.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.07k | £152.75k | £162.08k | £299.34k | £364.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION BY PREACHING AND PROMOTING ITS TEACHINGS, ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A GURDWARA OR GURDWARAS, CONDUCTING SERVICES, EDUCATION PROGRAMMES AND OBSERVANCES BASE ON THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE FAITH, AND ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING RELIGIOUS SCHOOLS OF INSTRUCTION FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHING, SHELTER AND OTHER NECESSITIES OF LIFE TO PEOPLE IN POVERTY OR WITHOUT VISIBLE MEANS OF SUPPORT AND TO THE ELDERLY, ILL AND DISABLED PEOPLE OF LOW OR MODEST INCOME AND IN NEED TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING OR SUPPORTING PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS AND TO WORK CO-OPERATIVELY WITH GOVERNMENTS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER COUNTRIES, AND WITH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS TO ACCOMPLISH THESE PURPOSES. TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DARBAR SRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB JI
Gobind Marg
Rollingmill Business Park
Rollingmill Street
WALSALL
WS2 9EQ
- Phone:
- 07828474626
- Email:
- sschohan1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window