FRIENDS OF WHITCHURCH PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1127434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raise money for the school by holding events and activities, such as; Christmas and Summer fairs, childrens discos, a disco for parents, cake sales, and a quiz and pudding night. Some examples of spending include outdoor play equipment, books for the library and KS1, Author visits, IT Equipment, class xmas presents, and forest schools equipment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £23,478
Total expenditure: £21,609

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • FOWPS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James William Huw Oliver Chair 12 September 2023
None on record
Leigh Rachel Hanby Trustee 12 September 2023
None on record
David Winter Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £49.35k £22.60k £24.75k £29.70k £23.48k
Total expenditure £36.54k £21.27k £36.91k £20.11k £21.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 December 2019 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WHITCHURCH C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
DANIEL ROAD
WHITCHURCH
RG28 7LS
Phone:
01256892755