Trustees COSHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1126959

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Williams | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brooks | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
George Simms | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Claire Pimlott | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Gregory | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Alexander Taylor | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Peter Woodroffe | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Morris Evans | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Helen Barnes | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Philip Tutte | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON ANDREW FORD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.