DUDDON INSHORE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sea rescue for any living person animal in peril from the sea.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 13 August 1970: Standard registration
- D I R (Working name)
- DIR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Mcnamee | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.40k | £10.80k | £10.15k | £33.15k | £38.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.04k | £13.29k | £10.15k | £14.55k | £12.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 03 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | 08 November 2024 | 436 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1720 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JULY 1970
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER THE SAFETY OF AND RENDER AN INSTANT AND EFFECTIVE RESCUE SERVICE FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF ANY PERSON OR PERSONS CRAFT OR LIVING THING IN PERIL FROM THE SEA WITHIN THE AREA OF THE DUDDON ESTUARY, SITUATE ON THE BOUNDARIES OF CUMBERLAND AND LANCASHIRE.
Area of benefit
DUDDON ESTUARY AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 DUDDON ROAD
ASKAM-IN-FURNESS
LA16 7AJ
- Phone:
- 01229463079
- Email:
- Chrismcnamee32@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window