Financial history FREILICH FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2019 30/12/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023
Total gross income £4.32k £116.25k £185.59k £180.25k £405.11k
Total expenditure £2.54k £118.20k £184.98k £178.91k £405.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A