DOCKLAND SCOUT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General boating including but not restricted to:- Canoeing, Dinghy and Keel boat sailing, pulling under oars, power boating and sport boating. Royal Yachting Association courses. British Canoe Union Courses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 November 2008: Standard registration
- DSP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN CARTWRIGHT | Chair |
|
||||||
Sam Longhurst | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Skinner | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Taylor | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Coombs | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN MAYNARD | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER MANSI | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PETCHEY | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BALTUTIS | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PIPPA BARBER | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HART | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL Stephen HUDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.16k | £57.55k | £47.96k | £150.87k | £161.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.97k | £56.00k | £42.58k | £85.05k | £120.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £900 | N/A | £800 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912, AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1949, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967 AND 19TH JULY 1991 03 SEP 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
HATFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HQTS LORD AMORY
631 MANCHESTER ROAD
LONDON
E14 3NU
- Phone:
- 0207630323
- Email:
- admin@lordamory.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window