THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, ANSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all.The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation.Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved.Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups.Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events.Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.Going into schools and putting on Christian productions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
Governance
- 07 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES CHURCH, ANSTON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Kirkham | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bill Lowe | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Sweet | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Wildgoose | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mira Joanne Robinson | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Edward Cushing | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE BRADEY | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE TEDDER | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CRAIG LITTLE | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER GEORGE HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA CUSHING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.85k | £64.28k | £67.79k | £57.35k | £75.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.64k | £69.38k | £62.18k | £52.98k | £58.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 FURNESS CLOSE
DINNINGTON
SHEFFIELD
S25 2TT
- Phone:
- 01142753030
- Email:
- PGHOWARD@SUPANET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window