Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, ANSTON
Charity Number: 1129033

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Kirkham | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bill Lowe | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Sweet | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Wildgoose | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mira Joanne Robinson | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Edward Cushing | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE BRADEY | Trustee | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE TEDDER | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CRAIG LITTLE | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER GEORGE HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA CUSHING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.