THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF COGGESHALL WITH MARKSHALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Coggeshall with Marks Hall is responsible for managing the administrative, fabric and financial activities of St Peter ad Vincula Church and St Nicholas' Chapel, both of Coggeshall and both Grade 1 listed buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 26 November 2008: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER AD VINCULA, COGGESHALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Melanie Jayne Shillito | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim James Butt | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Clifford Beckett | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Rachel Armour | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Malcolm Elliott | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Wargent | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Heike Prentice | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|||||
MARTIN BEVAN | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Brian Meads | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER SEMKEN | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS EDWARD TAYLOR | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Leigh Colbert | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA SUSAN CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET ELIZABETH FLORENCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.50k | £132.78k | £120.99k | £134.09k | £159.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.53k | £136.80k | £133.88k | £150.63k | £146.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Church Green
Coggeshall
Colchester
CO6 1UD
- Phone:
- 01376 563861
- Email:
- office.stpeters@caup.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window