Financial history ALDINGBOURNE PRIMARY SCOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126440
Charity reporting is overdue by 346 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £32.60k £25.25k £22.69k £14.20k £13.71k
Total expenditure £25.56k £14.39k £15.19k £8.41k £8.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A