MINCHINHAMPTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 October 2008: Previously excepted registration
- MBC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Thomas Scott | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Farley | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Daniel Brown | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Scott Coles | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.04k | £151.16k | £156.35k | £164.82k | £166.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.53k | £161.32k | £165.71k | £205.28k | £153.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINCHINHAMPTON BAPTIST CHURCH
TETBURY STREET
MINCHINHAMPTON
STROUD
GL6 9JH
- Phone:
- 01453886997
- Email:
- enquiries@minchbc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window