Trustees BEULAH BAPTIST CHURCH, BUCKHURST ROAD, BEXHILL-ON-SEA, EAST SUSSEX, TN40 1QA
Charity Number: 1126480

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Wightwick | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin McKay | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Lawrie | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Feakins | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Vernon Pannell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Howell | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Pragnell | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Henley | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Lockwood | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAT REIGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.