MAIDSTONE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP, PRAYER, BIBLE STUDY, PREACHING & TEACHING. BAPTISM. COMMUNION OF THE LORD'S SUPPER. EVANGELISM & MISSION. TEACHING, ENCOURAGEMENT & INCLUSION OF YOUNG PEOPLE. NURTURE & GROWTH OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES. TRAINING FOR CHRISTIAN & COMMUNITY SERVICE. GIVING PASTORAL CARE. SUPPORTING CHARITABLE SOCIAL ACTION IN THE UK & ABROAD. ENCOURAGING RELATIONSHIPS WITH OTHER CHRISTIANS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 01 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Flemons | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Riley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Weller | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Sherry | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Burgess-Clements | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Swannell | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Tozer | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA SMITH | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.02k | £116.48k | £129.71k | £183.36k | £134.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.64k | £104.74k | £130.69k | £128.79k | £180.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.27k | £14.62k | £9.19k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 18/11/2010 as amended on 21 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maidstone Baptist Church
Knightrider Street
Maidstone
ME15 6LU
- Phone:
- 01622686013
- Email:
- office@maidstonebaptist.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window