Trustees MAIDSTONE BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1128948

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Flemons | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Riley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Weller | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Sherry | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Burgess-Clements | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Swannell | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Tozer | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA SMITH | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.