PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST COLUMBA, CROSSPOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrine and practices of the Church of England. St Columba's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangellistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 02 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHURCH OF ST COLUMBA, CROSSPOOL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christopher John Ellis | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Dulcie Ley | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Jane Adcock | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Tracey Morris | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Burkinshaw | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Briony Margaret Broome | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARE ELIZABETH FOWLER | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tara Jane Osborne | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward Sherwood | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|||||
BRENDA NELSON | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE WILD | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WALES | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JACKY HODGSON B.A., M.A. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STEVE ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.21k | £93.51k | £110.93k | £91.26k | £106.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.07k | £92.14k | £98.54k | £100.27k | £103.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.03k | £2.59k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
503 MANCHESTER ROAD
Crosspool
Sheffield
S10 5PL
- Phone:
- 01142670006
- Website:
-
stcolumbacrosspool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window