Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST COLUMBA, CROSSPOOL
Charity Number: 1128336

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Christine Globe | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Cooke | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Dulcie Ley | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher John Ellis | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Jane Adcock | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Tracey Morris | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Burkinshaw | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Briony Margaret Broome | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tara Jane Osborne | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward Sherwood | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|||||
BRENDA NELSON | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACKY HODGSON B.A., M.A. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STEVE ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.