BURTON AND ROSSETT HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes horticulture and the exhibition thereof
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wrexham
Governance
- 23 March 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Genevieve Watson | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN Duckworth | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jane Morris | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Overson | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN BATES | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WEIR | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA IRENE WEIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.31k | £3.21k | £3.21k | £9.41k | £5.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £2.77k | £2.76k | £7.53k | £4.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 02 FEB 1970 AS AMENDED ON 11 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 MAY 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AT LARGE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HORTICULTURE AND THE EXHIBITION OF THE SAME AND OTHER CHARITIES WHICH OPERATES PRINCIPALLY IN THE BURTON AND ROSSETT CONNORBATIONS WITH PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE ASSOCIATED WITH HORTICULTURE AS AND WHEN THE COMMITTEE MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE BURTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 STONEWALLS
BURTON
ROSSETT
WREXHAM
LL12 0LG
- Phone:
- 01244571353
- Email:
- info@brhs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window