THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S, WELLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian Faith within the Anglican tradition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £53,835 from 1 government contract(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
99 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bexley
Governance
- 11 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. JOHN'S, WELLING (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Adam Julian David Foot | Chair | 06 December 2000 |
|
|
||||
Catherine May Woodcock | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Giles | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stephen Morris | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorin Mkala | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Micah Angela Resuella Derrota | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Beaumont | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Leslie Golding | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elizabeth wOOD | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Joan Read | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ESTELLE JEAN WOODCOCK | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Dowell | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Gompers | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Read | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Billy-Jo O'leary | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH MAURICE WOODCOCK | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £293.80k | £278.87k | £332.26k | £286.46k | £291.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £314.89k | £265.47k | £297.00k | £284.57k | £281.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £55.77k | £66.67k | £52.45k | £53.84k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.08k | £9.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John's Church
Danson Lane
Welling
Kent
DA16 2BQ
- Phone:
- 02083031107
- Email:
- office@stjohnswelling.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window