SOUTHERN EAST ANGLIA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Strengthen life and witness of Quaker meetings in S E Anglia area and beyond; spread Quaker message; undertake Quaker service to relieve suffering; fund Quaker concerns; provide pastoral care; maintain/develop Quaker meeting houses as places for public worship; administer/maintain the organisation of Southern East Anglia Meeting and contribute to the support of Britain Yearly Meeting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- SOUTHERN EAST ANGLIA MEETING (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Samuel | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jan Hutchinson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Halliwell | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Rayner | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Parkes | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.79k | £86.02k | £86.02k | £85.10k | £100.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.28k | £120.34k | £120.34k | £142.47k | £120.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.52k | £11.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 SEPTEMBER 2007 as amended on 09 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA OF THE SOUTHERN EAST ANGLIA MEETING AND BEYOND
Area of benefit
SOUTHERN EAST ANGLIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUAKER MEETING HOUSE
CHURCH STREET
COLCHESTER
CO1 1NF
- Phone:
- 01206240929
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window