THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WELLS ST CUTHBERT

Charity number: 1128484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Anglican church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £96,608
Total expenditure: £99,517

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST CUTHBERT'S PCC, WELLS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Samuel Denyer Chair 06 May 2017
BERRYMAN ANNUITY TRUST
Received: On time
Wells Blue School Charity
Received: On time
Patricia Ann Barrow Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Philip George Vivash Trustee 18 April 2018
None on record
Phil Kitcher Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
Alistair Bertram Glanvile Trustee 21 April 2015
None on record
Piers Herbert Rose Trustee 21 April 2015
None on record
Antonia Gwynn Trustee 21 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £95.82k £67.22k £105.80k £102.31k £96.61k
Total expenditure £91.88k £78.09k £91.16k £94.48k £99.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Cuthberts Church
St. Cuthbert Street
WELLS
Somerset
BA5 2AW
Phone:
01749676906