GLOUCESTERSHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are The Religious Society of Friends serving the Gloucestershire area. Commonly known as Quakers we meet for worship, mainly in silence. We are active in furthering the objectives of the Quaker testimonies to peace, equality, justice and simplicity. Our Meeting Houses are available to community groups, including other faiths. Enquirers of any faith, or none, are welcome at our meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 November 2012: Standard registration
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Christine Gerard | Chair | 19 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Fishpool | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andre Curtis | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Fiona Meadley | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ALYS EILBECK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.07k | £176.33k | £160.89k | £191.91k | £199.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.19k | £176.33k | £147.16k | £181.27k | £247.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 JUNE 2008 as amended on 08 Apr 2022 as amended on 17 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE AREA MEETING IS THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA OF THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE MEETING AND BEYOND.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Linked charities
- 27 November 2012 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quaker Meeting House
Quakers Close
Chestnut Hill
Nailsworth
STROUD
Gloucest
- Phone:
- 01453 832396
- Email:
- admin@glosquakers.org
- Website:
-
glosquakers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window