Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, NEW ALRESFORD, WINCHESTER
Charity number: 1127318

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Lees | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Whiteman | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Connell | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Roberts | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Will | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Whiffen | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wheeler | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Whale | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Scott-Morton | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douglas Waring Green | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Susan Teresa Ryton | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rex Bernard Corfield | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Jeanette Page | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Parsons | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Ann Skayman | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Geraldine Pinch | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS S CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ROSIE WARING GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.