THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BIRMINGHAM PARISH CHURCH (ST. MARTIN IN THE BULL RING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of public worship to which all are welcome. Pastoral care and evangelism. Discovering the Heart of God in the Heart of the City.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
105 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 30 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARTIN IN THE BULL RING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard Thomas Boycott Rodgers | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Afsoon Piroozan | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Kemoko | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Costacia Mukankusi | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Roshala Ravikumar | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sneha Raju Patole | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nellie Gerighty | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Murgatroyd | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Marie Bennett | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorretta Lamara Jones | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ivor David Eugene Lewis | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeremy Robert Allcock | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin James Walker | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
John Gerighty | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS M F WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ELSIE BLAIR-CHAPPELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Rachel Margaret Elizabeth Jepson | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEAN JEPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN BLAIR-CHAPPELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £478.12k | £413.37k | £306.15k | £431.73k | £366.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £405.48k | £368.90k | £292.63k | £352.58k | £379.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £63.08k | £21.00k | £2.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARTINS CHURCH
EDGBASTON STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B5 5BB
- Phone:
- 01216006020
- Email:
- jeremy@bullring.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window