PONTELAND METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1127080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing regular acts of worship open to church members and non-members. Teaching and promoting Christianity. Pastoral work. Taking religious assemblies in schools. Providing children's and youth clubs, and women's and men's meetings with a Christian ethos. Promoting the mission of the church. Supporting charities in the UK and overseas financially and through prayer.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £141,367
Total expenditure: £136,776

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Kirtley Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Elizabeth Armstrong Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Alison Winifred Bates Trustee 15 May 2017
None on record
PROF ROGER HERBERT DYE Trustee 15 May 2017
None on record
NIGEL HENRY GORDON BATES Trustee 28 April 2013
None on record
MARIANNE GROVES Trustee 19 August 2012
None on record
GEOFFREY EDWARD LISLE Trustee 17 May 2012
None on record
Ann Susan Cooper Trustee
None on record
FRANCIS SYDNEY COWAN Trustee
None on record
MARGARET WARD ASHFORD Trustee
None on record
Peter Michell Trustee
None on record
PAULINE GROVES Trustee
None on record
BRYAN ASHFORD Trustee
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Andrew Hislop Anderson Trustee
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
PONTELAND LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
RICHARD JOHN VARLEY Trustee
M ST J WAY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
PAMELA VARLEY Trustee
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ALAN GROVES Trustee
HEDDON VILLAGE KNOTT MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
ROSEMARY GRAY Trustee
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £118.94k £127.89k £120.11k £126.49k £141.37k
Total expenditure £123.67k £121.88k £120.76k £140.25k £136.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.00k £335 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 22 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 03 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 13 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ponteland Methodist Church
Bell Villas
Ponteland
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE20 9BE
Phone:
01661 872297
Email:
No information available